CA AB1741 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 228, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 6479.3 and 34013 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to cannabis, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis: taxation: electronic funds transfer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-13 - Assembly - AB 1741 BONTA Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 66 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1741 Bonta By Hertzberg Urgency Clause (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Assembly - AB 1741 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 228, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-28 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-16AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-13AssemblyUrgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 11. Page 6239.).
2018-08-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-09SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 6. Page 5232.).
2018-07-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-14SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 13).
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-05-22SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-21AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 12. Page 5246.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 9).
2018-04-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-25AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 16).
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-01-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 3.
2018-01-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code34013Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code6479.3Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback