CA AB1740 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-16 - In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-16 - In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 44017.4 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 4750.1 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: specially constructed vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-15 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-05-03 - Assembly - AB 1740 JEFFRIES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 22 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-05-03 - Assembly - AB 1740 JEFFRIES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 22 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-16 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2010-05-13 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2010-05-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-03 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 22. Page 4982.) | |
2010-04-26 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-04-22 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-04-21 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (April 21). | |
2010-04-06 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (April 5). | |
2010-04-05 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2010-03-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-22 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2010-02-09 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. | |
2010-02-08 | Read first time. To print. |