CA AB1736 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-27 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 16. Noes 20. Page 4874.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Pavley. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4875.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-27 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 16. Noes 20. Page 4874.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Pavley. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4875.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 54954.2, 54954.5, and 54957 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: open meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1736 Smyth Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1736 Smyth By Pavley (Y: 16 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Assembly - AB 1736 SMYTH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1736 Smyth By Pavley (Y: 16 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Assembly - AB 1736 SMYTH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-27 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 16. Noes 20. Page 4874.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Pavley. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4875.) | |
2012-08-22 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-21 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-06-18 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-15 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 13). | |
2012-06-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-05-03 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-04-26 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-04-26 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 3. Page 4556.) | |
2012-04-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-12 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11). | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-17 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |
2012-02-16 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 54950 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54954.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54954.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54957 | Amended Code | Citation Text |