CA AB1735 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 197, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 197, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1038, 1038.1, and 1038.2 of, and to add Section 1038.3 to, the Evidence Code, relating to evidentiary privilege.
Title
Evidence: privileges: human trafficking caseworker-victim privilege.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-15 - Assembly - AB 1735 Bauer-Kahan Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1735 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Assembly - AB 1735 Bauer-Kahan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1735 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Assembly - AB 1735 Bauer-Kahan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 197, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-08-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2727.). |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2053.). |
2019-07-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2019-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1040.) |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 26). |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Evidence Code | 1038 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Evidence Code | 1038.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Evidence Code | 1038.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Evidence Code | 1038.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |