CA AB173 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 65, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 65, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1957 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to golf carts.
Title
Golf carts: City of La Verne.
Sponsors
Asm. Chris Holden [D] | Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-22 - Senate - Special Consent #3 AB173 Holden By Liu (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Assembly - AB 173 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Assembly - AB 173 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 65, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-07-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | Enrolled measure version corrected. |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1550.). |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 9). |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 771.) |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 23). |
2015-02-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-01-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 22. |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 1957 | Amended Code | Citation Text |