CA AB1728 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 32139 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care districts: board of directors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1728 L. GOV. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2017-05-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
2017-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2017-03-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 22.
2017-03-22AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code32139New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback