CA AB1724 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Elections and Redistricting Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 23000 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 9 (commencing with Section 23000) of Division 21 of, and to add Chapter 10 (commencing with Section 24000) to Division 21 of, the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: general law city and county redistricting.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-18AssemblyReferred to Coms. on E. & R. and L. GOV.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code23000Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code24000New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback