CA AB1723 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 420, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 19613.05, 19640, and 19641 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to horse racing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Horse Racing Law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-16 - Assembly - AB 1723 G.O. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By GRAY (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1723 G.O. (Gray) By Portantino (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1723 G.O. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-02 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 420, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-02 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-27AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-16AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3548.).
2017-09-16AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3548.)
2017-09-15AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (September 15).
2017-09-15AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3485.)
2017-09-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2017-09-13AssemblyAssembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3254.)
2017-09-12AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2716.).
2017-08-31SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-30SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-08-24SenateOrdered to third reading.
2017-08-24SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2017-08-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-08-21SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-07-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-26SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-05-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1396.)
2017-04-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-03-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 16.
2017-03-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback