CA AB1721 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-01 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-01 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 130350.7 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority: transactions and use tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1721 REV. & TAX. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1622.) |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-03-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 16. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 130350.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |