CA AB172 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 165, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 68074 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public postsecondary education: residency: dependents of armed forces members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB172 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 172 CHÁVEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 165, Statutes of 2017.
2017-08-07 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-31AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2017-07-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-07-20SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2128.).
2017-07-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-07-17SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Coms. on ED. and V.A.
2017-05-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1388.)
2017-04-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2017-04-26AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-05AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-03-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
2017-02-23AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-02-09AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-01-30AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and V.A.
2017-01-18AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 17.
2017-01-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code68074Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback