CA AB1719 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 176, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 19191 and 24872.6 of, to amend the heading of Article 8 (commencing with Section 19191) of Chapter 4 of Part 10.2 of Division 2 of, and to repeal Section 19174 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1719 REV. & TAX (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1719 REV. & TAX. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 176, Statutes of 2017.
2017-08-07 Approved by the Governor.
2017-08-01AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
2017-07-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-07-20SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2130.).
2017-07-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-07-17SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-07-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-05-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1485.)
2017-05-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3).
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2017-03-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 16.
2017-03-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback