CA AB1708 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 236, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 236, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 515 of the Insurance Code, and to amend Section 16028 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: electronic verification of financial
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gatto [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-13 - Assembly - AB 1708 GATTO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1708 Gatto (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1708 GATTO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1708 Gatto (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1708 GATTO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 236, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2012-08-13 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 5887.). | |
2012-08-09 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-09 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4445.). | |
2012-08-07 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-07-05 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-07-03 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). | |
2012-06-12 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |
2012-06-11 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-06-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and INS. | |
2012-05-10 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-10 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4784.) | |
2012-05-03 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-05-02 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2). | |
2012-04-23 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-19 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-18 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-10 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |
2012-04-09 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-14 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |
2012-03-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2012-02-16 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | |
2012-02-15 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 515 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 16028 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 4462 | Amended Code | Citation Text |