CA AB1707 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 848, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 848, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11169 and 11170 of the Penal Code, relating to the Child Abuse Central Index.
Title
Child Abuse Central Index.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1707 AMMIANO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1707 Ammiano By Hancock (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1707 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1707 Ammiano By Hancock (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1707 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 848, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-30 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6605.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 13. Page 6641.). | |
2012-08-29 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-29 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 3. Page 4925.). | |
2012-08-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-24 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-23 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4786.) | |
2012-08-21 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-20 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). | |
2012-06-25 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-12 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-05-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-14 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 18. Page 4811.) | |
2012-04-19 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-18 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (April 18). | |
2012-03-29 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-14 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-03-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-02-16 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | |
2012-02-15 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11169 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 11170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |