CA AB1703 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 1.6 (commencing with Section 1102.50) of Chapter 2 of Title 4 of Part 4 of Division 2 of, and to add and repeal Section 2923.56 of, the Civil Code, relating to real property.
Title
Residential real property: sale of rental properties: right of first offer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1703 Bloom Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2120.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1102.50 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |