CA AB170 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 125000 of, and to add Sections 125003, 125004, and 125005 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to newborn screening.
Title
Newborn screening: genetic diseases: blood samples collected.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gatto [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 170 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2015-07-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 11. Page 1854.) |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (March 17). |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2015-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and HEALTH. |
2015-01-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 22. |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 125000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 125003 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 125004 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 125005 | New Code | See Bill Text |