CA AB17 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 99100) of Part 11 of Division 10 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transit Pass Pilot Program: free or reduced-fare transit passes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-12 - Assembly - AB 17 HOLDEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB17 Holden et al. By Allen (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 17 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 Vetoed by Governor.
2017-09-20AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2017-09-12AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 3208.).
2017-09-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-07SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 2. Page 2573.).
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 4. Page 1948.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-30AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
2017-05-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-01-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2016-12-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
2016-12-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code99100New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback