CA AB1699 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 398, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 398, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2898 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to telecommunications.
Title
Telecommunications: mobile internet service providers: first response agencies: emergencies.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1699 Levine Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1699 Levine By Jackson (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1699 Levine Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1699 Levine By Jackson (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1699 Levine Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 398, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3272.). |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.) |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2709.). |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2019-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1572.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on C. & C. and P. & C.P. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2898 | New Code | See Bill Text |