CA AB1690 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 160, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 3339 of the Civil Code, to amend Section 7285 of the Government Code, to amend Section 24000 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 1171.5 of the Labor Code, relating to personal rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal rights: compensatory relief.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-17 - Assembly - AB 1690 JUD. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By STONE (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1690 JUD. (Stone) By Leyva (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 1690 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By STONE (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-31 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 160, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-31 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-21AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-07-17AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 2567.).
2017-07-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-07-10SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1936.).
2017-06-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13).
2017-05-26SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-04-20SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-04-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 1136.)
2017-04-17AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-06AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 4).
2017-03-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-02-28AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
2017-02-27AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code3339Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code7285Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code24000Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code1171.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback