CA AB169 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-09-09 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Skinner.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 10860, 60900, 60900.5, 69400, 69432, 69432.9, 69433.9, 69617, 69996.9, and 70022 of, and to add Chapter 18.5 (commencing with Section 17200) to Part 10 of Division 1 of Title 1 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Postsecondary education trailer bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 169 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-09SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Skinner.
2021-09-08SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (September 7).
2021-09-05SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2021-09-01Senate(Ayes 30. Noes 9.)
2021-09-01SenateSenate rules suspended.
2021-09-01SenateJoint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 30. Noes 9.)
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2021-02-25SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-02-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 496.)
2021-02-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-02-22AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2021-02-22AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2021-02-22AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.)
2021-02-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2021-02-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2021-01-11AssemblyRead first time.
2021-01-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
2021-01-08AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback