CA AB1689 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51225.3 of, and to add Section 51221.1 to, the Education Code, relating to school curriculum.
Title
School curriculum: coursework for high school graduation: service learning.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-01-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 21. |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51221.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 51225.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |