CA AB1683 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 26004 and 26011.8 of the Public Resources Code, relating to alternative energy.
Title
Alternative energy financing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4943.) In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2016-03-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 20. |
2016-01-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 26004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26011.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |