CA AB1672 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3552, 3555.5, and 7926.300 of, and to add Title 26 (commencing with Section 110000) to, the Government Code, and to amend Sections 12301.6 and 12301.24 of, and to add Section 12300.8 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to in-home supportive services.
Title
In-Home Supportive Services Employer-Employee Relations Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1672 Haney Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-21 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 6. Page 2041.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 18). |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 110000 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 3552 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 3555.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 7926.300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12300.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12301.24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12301.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |