CA AB1672 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 779, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 779, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 50700, 50701, 50702, 50703, and 50704 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
Housing-Related Parks Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1672 TORRES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1672 Torres By Lowenthal (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1672 TORRES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1672 Torres By Lowenthal (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1672 TORRES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 779, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:45 p.m. | |
2012-08-27 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6304.). | |
2012-08-22 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 4696.). | |
2012-08-08 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-07 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 6). | |
2012-06-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-19 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-05-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-14 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 4823.) | |
2012-05-10 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-09 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 9). | |
2012-04-25 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-18 | Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |
2012-04-17 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-11 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and W., P. & W. | |
2012-02-15 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | |
2012-02-14 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 50700 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50701 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50702 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50703 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50704 | Amended Code | Citation Text |