CA AB1672 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-22 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 39511 of, to add Section 39510.5 to, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 39510 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to the State Air Resources Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Air Resources Board: election of board members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Elections and Redistricting (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-22 In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
2010-01-27 Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and E. & R.
2010-01-21 From printer. May be heard in committee February 20.
2010-01-20 Read first time. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback