CA AB1670 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1371.85 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10112.85 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1371.85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10112.85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1670 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1670 |