CA AB167 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11265 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CalWORKs: CalFresh: semiannual reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2018-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-09AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-03-08AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 7).
2017-02-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2017-02-27AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2017-01-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2017-01-18AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 17.
2017-01-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11265Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback