CA AB1668 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 15, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 15, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 531.10, 1120, 10608.12, 10608.20, 10608.48, 10801, 10802, 10814, 10817, 10820, 10825, 10826, 10843, 10845, and 10910 of, to add Sections 1846.5 and 10826.2 to, and to add Chapter 9 (commencing with Section 10609) and Chapter 10 (commencing with Section 10609.40) to Part 2.55 of Division 6 of, the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Water management planning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 1668 FRIEDMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 45 N: 26 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1668 Friedman et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1668 FRIEDMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 25 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1668 Friedman et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1668 FRIEDMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 25 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 15, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-05-31 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 45. Noes 26. Page 5200.). |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after May 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 4139.). |
2018-05-10 | Senate | (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 4116.) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 15). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Joint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2294.) |
2017-08-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-08-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-08-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-08-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 25. Page 1930.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 26). |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |