CA AB1668 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-8)
Status: Passed on September 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 684, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-8)
Status: Passed on September 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 684, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 111548) to Chapter 6 of Part 5 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to drugs and devices.
Title
Investigational drugs, biological products, and devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-23 - Assembly - AB 1668 CALDERON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1668 Calderon By Stone (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Business, Professions and Economic Development (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1668 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business and Professions (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1668 Calderon By Stone (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Business, Professions and Economic Development (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1668 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business and Professions (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 684, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 2. Page 6157.). |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5117.). |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B., P. & E.D. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 2. Page 5020.) |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-03-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P. |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 18. |
2016-01-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 111548 | New Code | See Bill Text |