CA AB1665 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 851, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 281, 912.2, and 914.7 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to communications, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telecommunications: California Advanced Services Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-15 - Assembly - AB 1665 GARCIA, E. Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 68 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1665 Eduardo Garcia By Hueso Urgency Clause (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1665 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 851, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-15 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-09-15AssemblyUrgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 8. Page 3504.).
2017-09-14AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (September 14).
2017-09-14AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3371.)
2017-09-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on C. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2017-09-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2017-09-13SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 2858.).
2017-09-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-08SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2017-09-01SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-08-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-17SenateIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-07-12SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2017-07-10SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-07-03SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2017-06-28SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 5. Page 2061.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyMeasure version as amended on May 2 corrected.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 26).
2017-05-26AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-02AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2017-03-21AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-03-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on C. & C.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code281Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code912.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code914.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback