CA AB1663 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 30515 and 30900 of, and to add Section 30902 to, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: assault weapons.
Sponsors
Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2016-03-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-01-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 14. |
2016-01-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 30515 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 30900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 30902 | New Code | See Bill Text |