CA AB1663 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - In committee: Set final hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - In committee: Set final hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Section 12318 of, and to repeal Article 3.5 (commencing with Section 12060) of Chapter 1 of Title 2 of Part 4 of, the Penal Code, relating to ammunition.
Title
Ammunition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-23 - Assembly - Set third hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | In committee: Set final hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2010-03-16 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-02 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-01-27 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-01-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 19. | |
2010-01-19 | Read first time. To print. |