CA AB1653 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11495.15 of, and to add Section 11495.20 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CalWORKs: victims of domestic violence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - State Assembly - AB 1653 GARCIA Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - State Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - State Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-14SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2014-08-04SenateIn committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2014-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-05SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2014-05-27SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2014-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5202.)
2014-05-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2014-05-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 21).
2014-05-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-05-06AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2014-05-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 29).
2014-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2014-04-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2014-02-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2014-02-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
2014-02-11AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1653&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1651-1700/ab_1653_bill_20140211_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1651-1700/ab_1653_bill_20140422_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1651-1700/ab_1653_bill_20140506_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1651-1700/ab_1653_bill_20140605_amended_sen_v96.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1651-1700/ab_1653_vote_20140429_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1651-1700/ab_1653_vote_20140521_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1651-1700/ab_1653_vote_20140527_0254PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1651-1700/ab_1653_vote_20140624_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1651-1700/ab_1653_vote_20140804_000001_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback