CA AB1650 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-26 - In Senate. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-26 - In Senate. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 9149.18 to the Government Code, relating to the Legislature, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Capitol Park.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-22 - Senate - Special Consent AB1650 Cooley Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1650 Cooley Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1650 Cooley Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2243.). |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and RLS. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1987.) |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 9149.18 | New Code | See Bill Text |