CA AB1650 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 573, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 573, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 2.7 (commencing with Section 2200) to Part 1 of Division 2 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: state and local contract eligibility:
Sponsors
Sen. Joel Anderson [R] | Asm. Karen Bass [D] | Sen. Marty Block [D] | Asm. Robert Blumenfield [D] |
Sen. Kevin de Leon [D] | Asm. Mike Feuer [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Jared Huffman [D] |
Asm. Dave Jones [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Ted Lieu [D] | Asm. Jeff Miller [R] |
Sen. Alex Padilla [D] | Sen. Fran Pavley [D] | Asm. John Perez [D] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] |
Sen. Curren Price [D] | Asm. Jim Silva [R] | Asm. Van Tran [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1650 Feuer Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-31 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB1650 Feuer By Leno (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1650 FEUER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Business and Professions (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-31 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB1650 Feuer By Leno (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1650 FEUER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Business and Professions (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 573, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-15 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. | |
2010-08-31 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6954.) | |
2010-08-31 | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 5058.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected September 8.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 3. Page 5084.) | |
2010-08-16 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12). | |
2010-08-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-08-02 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-07-01 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). | |
2010-06-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2010-06-01 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-01 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5398.) | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-05 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-28 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-27 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-21 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 20). | |
2010-04-14 | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. | |
2010-04-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-24 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2010-02-23 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-22 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 16). | |
2010-02-11 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. by unanimous consent, and then be re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2010-01-27 | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. | |
2010-01-14 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 13. | |
2010-01-13 | Read first time. To print. |