CA AB1645 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 62, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 62, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and repeal Section 12640.09 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Mortgage guaranty insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1645 Dababneh (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Assembly - AB 1645 DABABNEH Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Assembly - AB 1645 DABABNEH Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 62, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-07-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-07-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4649.). |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4359.) |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 12. |
2016-01-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 12640.09 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |