CA AB1643 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4663 of, and to add Section 4660.2 to, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Workers' compensation: permanent disability apportionment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1643 Gonzalez By Block (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1643 GONZALEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1643 GONZALEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 5243.). |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and APPR. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 20. Page 5078.) |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 5.) (May 27). |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-01-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 2810.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 4660.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 4663 | Amended Code | Citation Text |