CA AB163 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Hearing: Apr 23 @ 1:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 444
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 13309 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Services for unaccompanied undocumented minors: facilities liaison.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-26AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-01-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2019-01-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
2019-01-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1538.91New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1538.92New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code13309New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback