CA AB1621 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 76, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 76, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6216 of the Family Code, and to amend Sections 16520, 16531, 18010, 23910, 23920, 23925, 27510, 27530, 29180, 29182, 29805, and 30420 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 26835, 27535, and 27540 of, to add Sections 16515, 16517, 16519, 17312, 29185, and 30401 to, to repeal Sections 16532, 29181, 30405, 30406, 30412, and 30414 of, to repeal Articles 2 (commencing with Section 30442), 3 (commencing with Section 30470), and 4 (commencing with Section 30485) of Chapter 1.5 of Division 10 of Title 4 of Part 6 of, and to repeal and add Section 30400 of, the Penal Code, relating to firearms, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Firearms: unserialized firearms.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] |
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Assembly - AB 1621 Gipson Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 62 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1621 Gipson et al. By Portantino Urgency Clause (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1621 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1621 Gipson et al. By Portantino Urgency Clause (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1621 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 76, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-06-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-06-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 14.). |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4433.). |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 16). |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 4981.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 6216 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 16520 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 16531 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 18010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 23910 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 23920 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 23925 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26835 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 27510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27530 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27535 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 27540 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 29180 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 29182 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 29805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 30420 | Amended Code | Citation Text |