CA AB1619 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 340.16 to the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to sexual assault.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual assault: statutes of limitation on civil actions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-28 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [06-28-2017]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1619 BERMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-06-12SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-06-11SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-07-05SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-28SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Coms. on ED. and B., P. & E.D.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 2075.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-30AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 26).
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-04-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure340.16New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code94885.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback