CA AB1611 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 801, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 801, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3543.2 of the Government Code, relating to school employees.
Title
School employees: scope of representation: notice.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1611 Bonta By Torres (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 1611 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 1611 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 801, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 9. Page 4497.). |
2014-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 4). |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 4940.) |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 30). |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. |
2014-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2014-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3543.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |