CA AB1606 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 66025.3 of the Education Code, and to amend Section 890 of, and to repeal Section 896.1 of, the Military and Veterans Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: veterans: waiver of mandatory systemwide tuition and fees.
Sponsors
Asm. James Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-01-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and M. & V.A. |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 4. |
2022-01-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66025.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 890 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 896.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |