CA AB1603 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 25, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 25, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 155 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Sections 11253.4, 11320.32, 11402, 11450.025, 11461.3, 11465, 12301.02, 15200, 16519.5, 17601.50, and 18910.1 of, to amend and repeal Sections 11322.63 and 11450.04 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 11320.15, 11322.64, 11323.25, and 11450 of, to add Sections 11253.45, 11322.83, 11461.4, 12201.06, 16501.9, and 18920 to, to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 16523) to Chapter 5 of Part 4 of Division 9 of, to add Chapter 17 (commencing with Section 18999) to Part 6 of Division 9 of, and to repeal Section 15200.15 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public social services omnibus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - Assembly - AB 1603 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1603 Committee On BUDGET (Ting) By Leno (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1603 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1603 Committee On BUDGET (Ting) By Leno (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1603 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 25, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 5392.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 5392.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 5394.). |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 4376.). |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (June 15). Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 4327.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 4571.) |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 4488.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |