CA AB16 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7360 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Motor Vehicle Fuel Tax Law: adjustment suspension.
Sponsors
Asm. Diane Dixon [R] | Asm. Bill Essayli [R] | Asm. Joe Patterson [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
Asm. Tri Ta [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-12-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. |
2022-12-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7360 | Amended Code | Citation Text |