CA AB1598 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 764, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 764, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 5 (commencing with Section 62250) to Title 6 of the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Affordable housing authorities.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1598 MULLIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1598 Mullin et al. By Dodd (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1598 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1598 Mullin et al. By Dodd (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1598 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 764, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 3308.). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3254.) |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2682.). |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (July 11). |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 28). |
2017-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 1968.) |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24). |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 26). |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2017-04-21 | Assembly | Measure version as amended on April 20 corrected. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 62001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 62003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 62003.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 62004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 62250 | New Code | See Bill Text |