CA AB159 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-15 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 111548) to Chapter 6 of Part 5 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to drugs and devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Investigational drugs, biological products, and devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-02 - Assembly - AB 159 CALDERON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB159 Calderon By Stone (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Business, Professions and Economic Development (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Assembly - AB 159 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Business and Professions (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-15 Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
2015-10-11 Vetoed by Governor.
2015-09-14AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2015-09-02AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2795.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 2799.).
2015-09-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2015-09-01SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2344.).
2015-08-31SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
2015-07-13SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2015-07-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-06-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-06-19SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2015-06-16SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2015-06-15SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10).
2015-06-01SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2015-05-28SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and B., P. & E.D.
2015-05-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-05-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 1485.)
2015-05-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 13).
2015-04-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-28AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2015-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 21).
2015-04-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2015-04-13AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2015-04-09AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 7).
2015-02-02AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P.
2015-01-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
2015-01-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code111548New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_159&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_159_bill_20150121_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_159_bill_20150413_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_159_bill_20150428_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_159_bill_20150601_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_159_bill_20150616_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_159_bill_20150619_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_159_bill_20150706_amended_sen_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_159_bill_20150904_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_159_vote_20150407_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_159_vote_20150421_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_159_vote_20150513_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_159_vote_20150518_0114PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_159_vote_20150610_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_159_vote_20150629_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_159_vote_20150713_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_159_vote_20150827_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_159_vote_20150901_1201PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_159_vote_20150902_0119PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback