CA AB1588 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and G.O.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and G.O.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 12728.1 and 12728.3 to, and to add and repeal Section 12728.2 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to fireworks, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Fireworks: enforcement actions: funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1588 G.O. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1588 G.O. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and G.O. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1657.) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 17. |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 12728.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 12728.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 12728.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |