CA AB1588 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 742, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 742, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 114.3 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Professions and vocations: reservist licensees: fees and
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Allen [D] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. Bill Berryhill [R] | Sen. Marty Block [D] |
Asm. Betsy Butler [D] | Asm. Paul Cook [R] | Asm. Beth Gaines [R] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Sen. Richard Pan [D] | Asm. Manuel Perez [D] | Asm. Das Williams [D] | Asm. Mariko Yamada [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1588 ATKINS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1588 Atkins By Calderon (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1588 ATKINS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1588 Atkins By Calderon (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1588 ATKINS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 742, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:40 p.m. | |
2012-08-29 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1588.). | |
2012-08-28 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-28 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4884.). | |
2012-08-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-22 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-15 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2012-08-07 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-07-03 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2012-06-14 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2012-05-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-30 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5090.) | |
2012-05-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-03-28 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-03-13 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-06 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-03-05 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-17 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-02-07 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. | |
2012-02-06 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 114.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |