CA AB1580 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 494, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 494, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 1785.11.9, 1785.11.10, and 1785.11.11 to the Civil Code, relating to consumer credit reports.
Title
Consumer credit reports: security freezes: protected consumer.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gatto [D] | Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] |
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-23 - Assembly - AB 1580 GATTO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1580 Gatto By Hertzberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - AB 1580 GATTO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1580 Gatto By Hertzberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - AB 1580 GATTO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 494, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6155.). |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5128.). |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4791.) |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 14). |
2016-03-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and P. & C.P. |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 5. |
2016-01-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1785.11.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1785.11.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1785.11.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |