CA AB1578 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wiener.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 11362.6 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis programs: cooperation with federal authorities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1578 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 33 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-11SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wiener.
2017-08-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-28SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-06-28SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 27).
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 33. Page 2086.)
2017-05-08AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1418.)
2017-04-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 18).
2017-04-19AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-04-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-27AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code11362.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback