CA AB1575 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 776, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 776, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 5.5 (commencing with Section 49010) to Chapter 6 of Part 27 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, and to amend Section 905 of the Government Code, relating to pupil fees.
Title
Pupil fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1575 LARA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1575 Lara By Lowenthal (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1575 LARA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1575 LARA Assembly Third Reading Amend By LARA Set #1 (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1575 Lara By Lowenthal (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1575 LARA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1575 LARA Assembly Third Reading Amend By LARA Set #1 (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 776, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. | |
2012-08-27 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6382.). | |
2012-08-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-23 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 4745.). | |
2012-08-21 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-20 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-06 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-14 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-06-04 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-31 | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 5176.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5186.) | |
2012-05-30 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 5106.) | |
2012-05-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-04-18 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-03-22 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-02-02 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. | |
2012-02-01 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 14501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 35186 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 41020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49010 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 905 | Amended Code | Citation Text |